This case was last updated from Marathon County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 21:25:59 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Tammy Jean Sternitzky and Larry Alvin Sternitzky

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 In RE the marriage of Tammy Jean Sternitzky and Larry Alvin Sternitzky was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Marathon County Courts, Marathon County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Huber, Gregory and Marcus, Sandra J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0077

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Marathon, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Huber, Gregory

Marcus, Sandra J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sternitzky, Tammy Jean

Wausau, WI 54401

Respondent

Sternitzky, Larry Alvin

Stratford, WI 54484

Not Yet Classified

Tlusty, Kennedy & Glascock SC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Tlusty, Jessica J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Qualified domestic relations order; Court Official: Huber, Gregory; Additional Text: Marshfield Clinic Employees' Retirement plan signed 7/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment; Additional Text: of divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Party app finding of fact/conclusion of law/jdgmnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. qualified domestic relations order; Additional Text: Marshfield Clinic Employees Retirement Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet; Additional Text: (conf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.; Additional Text: of divorce signed 7/13/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.; Court Reporter: Tape recorder; Additional Text: Clerk Cheree Case called: 3:29pm Wife appears in person/pro se; Husband appears in person/pro se. T.S. sworn and testifies. L.S. sworn and testifies. COURT makes following rulings/findings: No minor children. Wife is not currently pregnant. Maintenance is waived by both parties except for debt repayment. Wife does not wish to resume surname/maiden name. Husband does not wish to resume surname/maiden name. Neither party is an active member of the military service. The marriage is irretrievably broken. Facts alleged in petition are true and correct and juris. stats. met; Marital Settlement Agreement approved and incorporated in Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law and Judgment of Divorce. COURT advises parties of remarriage warning. Divorce granted. BVS and Judgment to be filed by Mediator Attorney Jessica Tlusty. Adj: 3:34pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of Mediation Services by Atty Tlusty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Response and counterclaim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Larry A Sternitzky 3/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition without Minor Children; Additional Text: for divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: 21R 002489

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum; Additional Text: (conf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for appearance; Court Official: Huber, Gregory; Additional Text: Scheduling Order dated 2/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Respondents Information for Service by Sheriff; Additional Text: (conf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tlusty, Jessica J.