This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 15:44:35 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of: Tabitha Tracy Kuehnel and Dakota Douglas Kuehnel

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 In RE the marriage of Tabitha Tracy Kuehnel and Dakota Douglas Kuehnel was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Bastil, Samantha R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0367

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Bastil, Samantha R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kuehnel, Tabitha Tracy

Sheboygan Falls, WI 53085

Respondent

Kuehnel, Dakota Douglas

Sheboygan, WI 53083

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sehloff, Jacqueline Lorenz

Respondent Attorney

Kaufman, Kyle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Bastil, Samantha R.; Location: Circuit Court Branch #1; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on February 3, 2022 at 08:15 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Atty. Sehloff - Re: Adjournment of January 10 Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Response and counterclaim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Atty Kaufman - Confirming Rescheduling of Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 011788, Payable Number: 357193, Receipt Number: 21R 017728, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty. Kaufman for Dakota

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Kuehnel, Dakota Douglas; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Dakota Douglas Kuehnel Current: 2545 Enterprise Drive, Sheboygan, WI 53083 United States (Effective: 09-15-2021) Prior: 2103 North 12th Street, Sheboygan, WI 53081 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Atty. Kaufman RE: NOR and an updated address for his client

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Atty. Kaufman RE: 01/06/2022 PTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: as to Dakota

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition without Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial order; Court Official: Bastil, Samantha R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 011215, Payable Number: 356643, Receipt Number: 21R 016637, Amount: $214.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaufman, Kyle