This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 16:49:02 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Sarah Elizabeth Gossett and Omar NMI Granados

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 In RE the marriage of Sarah Elizabeth Gossett and Omar NMI Granados was filed as a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Levine, Elliott M and Wright, Elizabeth A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0264

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Levine, Elliott M

Wright, Elizabeth A

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Gossett, Sarah E

La Crosse, WI 54601

Gossett, Sarah Elizabeth

La Crosse, WI 54601

Respondents

Granados, Omar

La Crosse, WI 54601

Granados, Omar NMI

La Crosse, WI 54601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Davig, Sonja C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Certificate of Attendance - Familes First Class - Sarah and Omar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: PE/Sarah Gossett paid $50 thru AllPaid for Families First.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: RE/Omar Granados paid $50 thru AllPaid for Families First.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Parenting Plan - Joint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Parenting Plan - Joint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from FCC - Failure to Attend - Families First Program - Sarah and Omar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Wright, Elizabeth A.; Additional Text: Families First Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 007699, Payable Number: 186203, Receipt Number: 21R 012469, Amount: $214.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davig, Sonja C.