This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 16:29:30 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Sabrina M DeBruin-Krenn and Todd Everett Krenn

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 In RE the marriage of Sabrina M DeBruin-Krenn and Todd Everett Krenn was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Haase, LaKeisha D and Bermingham, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0552

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Haase, LaKeisha D

Bermingham, John

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DeBruin-Krenn, Sabrina M

Menasha, WI 54952

Respondent

Krenn, Todd Everett

Neenah, WI 54956

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingDescription: Default divorce; Court Official: Bermingham, John; Location: 1st Floor, Room 141; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from CC Bermingham to Sabrina. Copy sent to Todd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Original received via mail from PE re:language in recent order with attachments. Routed to CC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Default divorce on January 31, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: for RE. Submitted by PE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended; Additional Text: Findings and Order from 09/30/2021 hearing. Copy mailed to the Petitioner, Respondent and CSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner; Additional Text: confidential

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause hearing; Court Official: Bermingham, John; Additional Text: Hearing on temporary order. Court drafted order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent; Additional Text: confidential

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: Bermingham, John; Additional Text: from hearing held on 09/30/2021 - copy given to each party in court - copy sent to CSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Filing Court Official: John Bermingham

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Default divorce on January 31, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause; Court Official: Bermingham, John; Additional Text: for Temporary Order. Copy to CSA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: of divorce with minor children. Submitted by PE. Copy to CSA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 505821, Payable Number: 306884, Receipt Number: 21R 026996, Amount: $214.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons; Additional Text: of divorce with minor children. Submitted by PE. Copy to CSA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: to show cause and request hearing for temporary order with minor children. Submitted by PE.

    Read MoreRead Less