This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 22:54:10 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Quinton Josett and Alicia Joy Stephenson

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 In RE the marriage of Quinton Josett and Alicia Joy Stephenson was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Klicko, Wendy J. N and Screnock, Michael P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0051

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Klicko, Wendy J. N

Screnock, Michael P

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Josett, Quinton

Reedsburg, WI 53959

Respondent

Stephenson, Alicia Joy

Portage, WI 53901

Not Yet Classified

State of Wisconsin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Vesely, Tori A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Klicko, Wendy J. N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Klicko, Wendy J. N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from FCC O'Rourke to Parties ref. Children in Between Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from FCC O'Rourke to Attny Nugent ref. Children in Between Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone status conference on August 3, 2021 at 08:45 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Stephenson, Alicia Joy; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Alicia Joy Stephenson Current: 2646 New Pinery Road, Portage, WI 53901 United States (Effective: 05-07-2021) Prior: 2646 New Pinery Road, Portage, WI 53901 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Josett, Quinton; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Quinton Josett Current: 519 W. 2nd Street, Reedsburg, WI 53959 United States (Effective: 05-07-2021) Prior: 519 West 2nd Street, Reedsburg, WI 53959 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Stephenson, Alicia Joy; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Alicia Joy Stephenson Current: 2646 New Pinery Road, Portage, WI 53901 United States (Effective: 05-06-2021) Prior: 703 Monroe Street, Portage, WI 53901 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter from Family Court Commissioner dated 4/20/21 to parties re div ed class

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Josett, Quinton; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Quinton Josett Current: 519 West 2nd Street, Reedsburg, WI 53959 United States (Effective: 04-19-2021) Prior: 1300 Lange Crt., Baraboo, WI 53913 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Response/reply; Additional Text: From RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition and Order for Waiver of Fees Granted for Josett, Quinton; Court Official: Screnock, Michael P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Text Message Alert Sign Up

    Read MoreRead Less