This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 09:23:05 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Morgan Lea Ladwig and Michael James Ladwig

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 In RE the marriage of Morgan Lea Ladwig and Michael James Ladwig was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Basiliere, Teresa S and Krueger, Lisa M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0206

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Basiliere, Teresa S

Krueger, Lisa M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ladwig, Morgan Lea

Menasha, WI 54952

Respondent

Ladwig, Michael James

La Crosse, WI 54601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Additional Text: of Divorce/Copies sent to: PE, RE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Vital statistics form; Additional Text: Submitted to Madison

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default divorce; Court Official: Krueger, Lisa M.; Court Reporter: Recorder Rm142, DAR; Additional Text: Minutes - divorce granted to Petitioner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Krueger, Lisa M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Martial Settlement Agreement. Original only submitted by PE at COC counter. Routed to Family Clerk for review. 9/14/2021 clr, routed to FCC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: PE. Original and 3 copies submitted at COC counter by PE. Original and 1 copy returned to PE. 1 set routed to CSA. Routed to FCC for review. 09/14/2021 jlr per FCC file only.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Krueger, Lisa M.; Additional Text: 11:44 AM Petitioner Morgan Lea Ladwig in court. Respondent Michael James Ladwig appeared by phone means. No resolution. Court adjourns.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Default divorce on September 23, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Original received via fax from RE re: telephone appearance. Routed to FCC. 08/24/2021 clr, per FCC, file only, RE called in for status conference.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on September 14, 2021 at 11:45 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Krueger, Lisa M.; Additional Text: Court adjourns to allow parties time to file MSA/FDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Default divorce on August 24, 2021 at 10:15 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children; Additional Text: for Divorce with Stipulation for Temporary Order only signed by one party and blank Temporary Order. All documents submitted as one form. Submitted by Morgan Ladwig. Routed to FCC for review. Copy to CSA. 03/23/2021 clr, per FCC, The Summons is not signed. The Stipulation and Temporary Order are not valid since they are only signed by one party.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $204.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 115771, Payable Number: 297647, Receipt Number: 21R 008110, Amount: $204.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Filing Court Official: Lisa M. Krueger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less