This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 01/27/2022 at 12:10:52 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Michelle Lynn Pederson and Jason Lawrence Pederson

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 In RE the marriage of Michelle Lynn Pederson and Jason Lawrence Pederson was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Brantmeier, Bennett J and Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0164

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Brantmeier, Bennett J

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pederson, Michelle Lynn

Watertown, WI 53098

Respondent

Pederson, Jason Lawrence

Watertown, WI 53098

Not Yet Classified

State Of Wisconsin

Courthouse-Room 219, Child Support Enforcement

Jefferson, WI 53549

Miller, Joann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wolter, Jacquelyn

Respondent Attorney

Tabor, Lucas Troy

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Wick, Kendall Kay

Antholine, Thomas Edward

Miller, Joann L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingDescription: Stipulated divorce pre-trial conference; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Location: Room 220; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Attorney Miller re: Mediated Parenting Agreement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Temporary Mediated Parenting Agreement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Mediation agreement; Additional Text: Proposed Order - submitted by Atty Miller with cover letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Appraisal of Property, filed by Attorney Tabor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated divorce pre-trial conference; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Court Reporter: Unmonitored DAR; Additional Text: hearing on 11/29/2021- (WEB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Pederson, Michelle Lynn; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Michelle Lynn Pederson Current: 509 Sweetbriar Lane, Watertown, WI 53098 United States (Effective: 11-29-2021) Prior: 12 Riverdale Circle, Watertown, WI 53094

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated divorce pre-trial conference on January 31, 2022 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Mediation agreement; Additional Text: Proposed Order - submitted by Atty Miller with cover letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Temporary Mediated Parenting Agreement.

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 110068, Payable Number: 183046, Receipt Number: 21R 011989, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Tabor for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Response and counterclaim; Additional Text: -filed by Atty Tabor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children; Additional Text: PC: IVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $194.5; Additional Text: 21R 011010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $45.0; Additional Text: 21R 011010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miller, Joann L