This case was last updated from Sawyer County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 01:00:19 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Michael Thompson and Shelly Thompson

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 In RE the marriage of Michael Thompson and Shelly Thompson was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Sawyer County Courts, Sawyer County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Yackel, John M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0044

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Sawyer, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Yackel, John M

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Duffy, Thomas J

Hayward, WI 54843

Thompson, Michael

Hayward, WI 54843

Thompson, Shelly

Eau Claire, WI 54701

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Court Reporter: Biskup, Candace; Additional Text: 02:07 PM ON THE RECORD: Mediator Thomas J Duffy in court. Joint Petitioner Michael Thompson in court. Joint Petitioner Shelly Thompson appeared by phone. Court calls case and recites appearances. Court notes that all required paperwork has been filed. Mediator Thomas J Duffy states that both parties wish to proceed. Both parties sworn in by Judge Yackel. PE testifies. PE provided updated address. Marriage is irretrievably broken. Financial Disclosure Statements are accurate. Finds the MSA fair and reasonable. Knowingly waives maintenance. No minor children. RE testifies. RE provided updated address. Marriage is irretrievably broken. Financial Disclosure Statements are accurate. Finds the MSA fair and reasonable. Knowingly waives maintenance. Does not wish to resume use of former surname/maiden name. No minor children. Not pregnant at this time. The Court finds that it has jurisdiction in this matter. The Court accepts the testimony of the parties and finds that the marriage is irretrievably broken. Financial Disclosures are accepted as true and accurate. The Court approves of the Marital Settlement Agreement and incorporates it into the Judgment of Divorce. Maintenance is waived/denied to both parties. Wife is not pregnant at this time. There are no minor children. Wife is not requesting the use of former surname/maiden name. Divorce is granted, effective today. Parties may not marry within six month from today's date. 02:18 ADJOURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Thompson, Michael; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Michael Thompson Current: 10598 Main Street, Hayward, WI 54843 United States (Effective: 12-15-2021) Prior: 105 N Main, Hayward, WI 54843 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Thompson, Shelly; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Shelly Thompson Current: 3607 Trimble St., Eau Claire, WI 54701 United States (Effective: 12-15-2021) Prior: 9929 N. Cindy Avenue, Hayward, WI 54843 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Additional Text: Mailed certified copies of FFCLJ and MSA to both parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation - At/After Trial; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet; Additional Text: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet mailed to Vital Records on this date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner; Additional Text: Michael Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent; Additional Text: Shelly Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated Divorce Hearing on December 15, 2021 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint Petition without Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $204.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002083, Payable Number: 67491, Receipt Number: 21R 003952, Amount: $204.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less