This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 01/27/2022 at 13:22:12 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Melanie L. Clark-Duneman and Danny L. Duneman

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 In RE the marriage of Melanie L Clark-Duneman and Danny L Duneman was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Radcliffe, Richard and Heitman, Richard J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0122

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Radcliffe, Richard

Heitman, Richard J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Clark-Duneman, Melanie L.

Tomah, WI 54660

Respondent

Duneman, Danny L.

Norwalk, WI 54648

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Precour, Penny Jean

Respondent Attorney

Pierce, Bryan I

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated Divorce Hearing on January 31, 2022 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Dated 11/30/21 from Judge Radcliffe to Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Temporary Order and Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Radcliffe, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004907, Payable Number: 163298, Receipt Number: 21RT002573, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Bryan Pierce retained by Danny Duneman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and petition; Court Official: Radcliffe, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004617, Payable Number: 163030, Receipt Number: 21RT002420, Amount: $214.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit for Temporary Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pierce, Bryan I