This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 01/27/2022 at 17:46:15 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Maria Mercedes Errecart and Einstein A. Gonzalez-Leon

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 In RE the marriage of Maria Mercedes Errecart and Einstein A Gonzalez-Leon was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacobson, R. Scott, Beer, James R and Phillipson, Faun Marie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0090

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Jacobson, R. Scott

Beer, James R

Phillipson, Faun Marie

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Errecart, Maria Mercedes

Brooklyn, WI 53521

Gonzalez-Leon, Einstein A.

Brooklyn, WI 53521

Green County Child Support

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Feliz, Ray

Bucholtz, Brian Donald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Jacobson, R. Scott; Additional Text: of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Jacobson, R. Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Jacobson, R. Scott; Additional Text: Proposed Order for Dismissal of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: Stipulation for Dismissal of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of assignment of judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint Petition without Minor Children; Court Official: Beer, James R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $204.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002927, Payable Number: 86516, Receipt Number: 21R 004766, Amount: $204.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Einstein Gonzalez-Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement; Additional Text: MSA without minor children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Maria Bidart

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Feliz, Ray

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bucholtz, Brian Donald