This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 13:55:21 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Marek Slawomir Wasilewski and Ewa Teresa Wasilewski

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 In RE the marriage of Marek Slawomir Wasilewski and Ewa Teresa Wasilewski was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Stacy A, Kujak, Angela and Curran, Paul S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0043

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Stacy A

Kujak, Angela

Curran, Paul S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wasilewski, Marek Slawomir

Necedah, WI 54646

Respondent

Wasilewski, Ewa Teresa

Milwaukee, WI 53228

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.; Location: Juneau County Justice Center-Branch 1; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Telephone status conference; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.; Additional Text: Marek Wasilewski via telephone without counsel. Ewa Wasilewski via telephone without counsel. Ewa has not turned in financials yet. Parties have gone through mediation and have reached an agreement. Paperwork for property division still needs to be taken care of. MSA will be mailed to both parties. Court wants Ewa to turn in financial paperwork two weeks prior to final hearing. Final hearing set for February 15, 2022 at 11:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated Divorce Hearing on February 15, 2022 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: MSA paperwork mailed to both parties with the NOH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Additional Text: Wasilewski Mediation Agreement Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter to parties re: Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Mediation agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Report; Additional Text: Mediation report

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Court Reporter: Tape Recorder; Additional Text: 02:59 PM Petitioner Marek Slawomir Wasilewski in court. Respondent Ewa Teresa Wasilewski appeared by phone means. COURT: Mediation ordered. Parties advised to file paperwork necessary to finalize divorce. Refer to Judge Smith for scheduling.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for referral to family court counseling; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on September 8, 2021 at 03:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: 6/29/21 - E. Wasilewski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons/petition w/ child support or maint request; Amount: $194.5; Additional Text: 21R 002490

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling order; Court Official: Curran, Paul S.; Additional Text: Preliminary ....

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less