This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 01/27/2022 at 19:48:39 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Lucretia I Macha and Lonnie A Macha

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 In RE the marriage of Lucretia I Macha and Lonnie A Macha was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Weymouth, Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0239

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Weymouth, Richard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Macha, Lucretia I

Marshfield, WI 54449

Respondent

Macha, Lonnie A

Pittsville, WI 54466

Not Yet Classified

Wood County Child Support Agency

400 Market St

Wisc Rapids, WI 54495

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gebert, Timothy S.

Respondent Attorney

Lloyd, Peter C, c

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Kastenholz, Peter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Settlement conference; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard; Location: Reserve Courtroom; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Settlement conference on February 3, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for income withholding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for income withholding; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order hearing; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard; Court Reporter: TAPE REPORTER; Additional Text: 10:27 AM Attorney Timothy S. Gebert in court for Petitioner Lucretia I Macha. Attorney Peter C Lloyd in court for Respondent Lonnie A Macha. Attorney Gebert states the parties have reached an temporary agreement and recites it for the Court. Attorney Lloyd states he is in agreement. Parties are in agreement to the stipulation as recited. Attorney Gebert will draft the order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008177, Payable Number: 128530, Receipt Number: 21R 007633, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated divorce pre-trial conference on November 11, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 007277, Payable Number: 127893, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Lonnie Macha - served July 12, 2021 @ 2:23 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause for temporary order; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kastenholz, Peter