This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 23:57:57 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Lisa Jensen Ehlers and Douglas Clarence Ehlers

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 In RE the marriage of Lisa Jensen Ehlers and Douglas Clarence Ehlers was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Levine, Elliott M, Wright, Elizabeth A and Pedretti, Tammy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0054

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Levine, Elliott M

Wright, Elizabeth A

Pedretti, Tammy

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Ehlers, Douglas Clarence

La Crosse, WI 54601

Ehlers, Lisa Jense

La Crosse, WI 54601

Ehlers, Douglas

La Crosse, WI 54601

Ehlers, Lisa Jensen

La Crosse, WI 54601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default divorce; Court Official: Wright, Elizabeth A.; Court Reporter: Digital recorder; Additional Text: 09:08 AM Joint Petitioner Douglas Clarence Ehlers appeared by video means. Joint Petitioner Lisa Jensen Ehlers appeared by video means. Parties sworn Parties testify as to Petition, Financials and MSA. Court makes findings - Divorce Granted. Marriage is irretrievably broken, maintenance waived to both parties, wife is not pregnant, MSA incorporated into findings. Wife wishes to restore her former surname of Jensen for future use.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet; Additional Text: mailed to BVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default/uncontested judgment, awaiting final paper; Court Official: Wright, Elizabeth A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Wright, Elizabeth A.; Additional Text: mailed to parties 11-5-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Wright, Elizabeth A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Default divorce on November 5, 2021 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Instructions for How to Appear Remotely

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: FFCLJ & Divorce/Annulment Worksheet filed

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: JP Wife

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: JP Wife

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Ehlers, Lisa Jensen; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Lisa Jense Ehlers Current: 3011 33rd Street South #3, La Crosse, WI 54601 United States (Effective: 04-20-2021) Prior: 520 Central Ave, Holmen, WI 54636 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Ehlers, Lisa Jensen; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Lisa Jense Ehlers Current: 520 Central Ave, Sparta, WI 54656 United States (Effective: 02-25-2021) Prior: 520 Central Ave, Holmen, WI 54636 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: JP Husband

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: 21R 002755

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint Petition without Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: JP/Lisa Ehlers paid $184.50 thru AllPaid for Divorce/No Minor child; plus $7.50/copy fee.

    Read MoreRead Less