This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 09:21:35 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Lauren F Schmidt and Andrew R Schmidt

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 In RE the marriage of Lauren F Schmidt and Andrew R Schmidt was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Mozinski, Lorene, Oleniczak, Victoria A, Cafferty, Kristin M, Lamberty, Aaron and Fredrickson, Jon E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0242

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Mozinski, Lorene

Oleniczak, Victoria A

Cafferty, Kristin M

Lamberty, Aaron

Fredrickson, Jon E

 

Party Details

Defendant

the marriage of Lauren F Schmidt and {Joint Petitioner 2}

Not Yet Classified

Schmidt, Lauren F

Racine, WI 53405

Schmidt, Andrew R

White House, TN 37188

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet; Additional Text: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet (DAW) received, processed, and sent to the State. NOTE: DAW not retained in court record; therefore, if submitted via efile system, DAW is printed and rejected.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Clerk's mailing of final divorce documents mailed to non-efiled party(ies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Schmidt, Andrew R; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Andrew R Schmidt Current: 3982 Bilbrey Dr, White House, TN 37188 United States (Effective: 07-28-2021) Prior: 1133 Kentucky St, Racine, WI 53405 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Final hearing; Court Official: Lamberty, Aaron; Court Reporter: DIGITAL RECORDING; Additional Text: 01:33 PM Joint Petitioner Lauren F Schmidt in court. Joint Petitioner Andrew R Schmidt appeared by phone means. Divorce granted on 7/28/21. FOF signed by Commissioner at final hearing. Sent to Family Court for further processing. Review scheduled for August 28, 2021 at 08:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Lamberty, Aaron; Additional Text: Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment of Divorce/MSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation - Before Trial; Court Official: Lamberty, Aaron

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Final documents left with DFCC A.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Phone request for Andrew Schmidt approved. Court will contact you when the hearing is called.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Email req from Mr. schmidt to appear by phone for 7/28 SC. Fwd to DFCC Lamberty for review/status.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Final documents letter of correction sent to parties. Final divorce documents are located on 3rd floor for one of the parties to pick-up and make corrections.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Scheduling conference on July 28, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: Oleniczak, Victoria A.; Additional Text: STIPULATED Temporary Order/Financial Disclosure Statements received/approved. NO appearances required for first hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for appearance; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: JP Husband

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: JP Wife

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint Petition without Minor Children; Additional Text: DOM: 4/7/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: 21R 002873F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Parties are to return with the Joint Petition signed. OFA is prepared and placed in pick up bin awaiting return of Joint Petition

    Read MoreRead Less