This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 01/27/2022 at 13:19:59 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of: Kristy Ann Mulder and Scott Francis Harol Mulder

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 In RE the marriage of Kristy Ann Mulder and Scott Francis Harol Mulder was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Borowski, Daniel J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0247

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Borowski, Daniel J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mulder, Kristy Ann

Glenbeulah, WI 53023

Respondent

Mulder, Scott Francis Harol

Glenbeulah, WI 53023

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Moore, Lisa M.

Respondent Attorney

Darrow, Dwight Daniel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: Borowski, Daniel J; Location: Circuit Court Branch #5; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on February 21, 2022 at 08:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Borowski, Daniel J; Court Reporter: Pomrening, Stacie; Additional Text: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Instructions on How to Appear Remotely by Zoom on January 18, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Borowski, Daniel J; Court Reporter: Rodencal, Kailee A; Additional Text: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Instructions on How to Appear Remotely by Zoom for the week of December 13, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Marital Property Agreement Regarding Real Estate (filed by Atty Darrow)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on December 13, 2021 at 08:15 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 010843, Payable Number: 356453, Receipt Number: 21R 016271, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Moore for Kristy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: as to Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children; Additional Text: 10/13/2021 at 8:15 in Branch 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: 21R 011761

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $22.5; Additional Text: 21R 011761

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial order; Court Official: Borowski, Daniel J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darrow, Dwight Daniel