This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 19:12:08 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of: Kimberly Ann Schueller and Jeremy Michael Schueller

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 In RE the marriage of Kimberly Ann Schueller and Jeremy Michael Schueller was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are O'Rourke, Ryan and Bastil, Samantha R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0387

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

O'Rourke, Ryan

Bastil, Samantha R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Schueller, Kimberly Ann

Sheboygan, WI 53081

Respondent

Schueller, Jeremy Michael

Plymouth, WI 53073

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sehloff, Jacqueline Lorenz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingDescription: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: O'Rourke, Ryan; Location: Room B-10; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment; Additional Text: Electronically sent to judge to hold until 02/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Atty Sehloff - confirming the 1/31/2022 STDH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement; Additional Text: Addendum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Joint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. temporary order; Additional Text: sent up for judge's signature 10/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: as to Jeremy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: O'Rourke, Ryan; Additional Text: by Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition without Minor Children

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial order; Court Official: Bastil, Samantha R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 011750, Payable Number: 357098, Receipt Number: 21R 017469, Amount: $214.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sehloff, Jacqueline Lorenz