This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 01/26/2022 at 13:14:32 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Katie M. Leibfried and Gary R. Leibfried

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 In RE the marriage of Katie M Leibfried and Gary R Leibfried was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is VanDeHey, Robert P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0159

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

VanDeHey, Robert P

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Leibfried, Katie M.

Dubuque, IA 52002

Respondent

Leibfried, Gary R.

Potosi, WI 53820

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Skemp, Kim John, Aty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.; Additional Text: Clerk's minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation - At/After Trial; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of mailing; Additional Text: judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated Divorce Hearing on August 12, 2021 at 09:00 am. You may join this hearing by video using the following website: https://wicourts.zoom.us/j/600348151 (meeting ID: 600-348-151). To appear by video, you will need a web camera and microphone. If you are unable to join by internet using video, you may join the hearing by phone by calling 1-312-626-6799 (meeting ID: 600-348-151). If you wish to appear in person, please contact Judge VanDeHeys Judicial Assistant at (608) 723-7826.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion and prop. order for withdrawal of counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion and order for withdrawal of counsel; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition without Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $204.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002704, Payable Number: 144602, Receipt Number: 21R 003249, Amount: $204.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Skemp, Kim John, Aty