This case was last updated from St. Croix County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 18:33:26 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Joshua James Lee Crawmer and Hannah Marie Crawmer

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 In RE the marriage of Joshua James Lee Crawmer and Hannah Marie Crawmer was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Croix County Courts, St. Croix County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Needham, Scott, Heckmann, Timothy C and Dunlap, Stephen J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0295

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    St. Croix, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Needham, Scott

Heckmann, Timothy C

Dunlap, Stephen J

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Crawmer, Joshua James Lee

Woodbury, MN 55125

Crawmer, Hannah Marie

Baldwin, WI 54002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default divorce; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.; Court Reporter: TAPE REPORTER; Additional Text: 01:30 PM Court Commissioner: Tim Heckmann, Reporter: Unmonitored DAR, Clerk: Benoy Joint Petitioner Joshua James Lee Crawmer appeared by video means. Joint Petitioner Hannah Marie Crawmer appeared by video means. S/T Parties. JP Joshua Crawmer is not in the military. Marriage is irretrievably broken. FDS on file. Waives maintencance. Parties have one minor child. Joint legal custody & shared placement. Child support held open. Uninsured medical expenses & variable expenses to be shared. Mr Crawmer to claim the child every year as a tax exemption. JP Hannah Crawmer is not in the military and not pregnant. Marriage is irretrievably broken. FDS on file. Waives maintencance. May resume her legal surmane of Smith. Court finds statutory waiting period has passed and all requirements met. Court approves debt and property division. Court finds marriage is irretrievably broken. Facts alleged in petition are true and correct. MSA is incorporated into Judgment. Court awards absolute judgment of divorce to parties. Court advises the parties not to remarry for a period of six months. Adjourned: 1:42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Needham, Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet; Additional Text: Original mailed to State. mab

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.; Additional Text: Signed by TCH 1/12/22. cc: parties by mail.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Default divorce on January 12, 2022 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Parent education class; Additional Text: Parents in Transition Certificate of Completion - Hannah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Parent education class; Additional Text: Parents in Transition Certificate of Completion - Joshua

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Parenting Plan - Joint; Additional Text: Signed by parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: for Joshua Crawmer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: for Hannah Crawmer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement; Additional Text: Signed by parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation for temporary order; Additional Text: Filed by parties. Reviewed by CSA. Signed by SJD 10/18/21. blk c: parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. stipulation and prop. order; Additional Text: Filed by parties. mab to CSA & SJD 10/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Dunlap, Stephen J.; Additional Text: for Parents in Transition, signed by FCC Dunlap.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint petition; Additional Text: 2c: PE. c: CSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $194.5; Additional Text: 21R 013293

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less