This case was last updated from St. Croix County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 07:18:35 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Joseph B Saluri and Lori L Saluri

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 In RE the marriage of Joseph B Saluri and Lori L Saluri was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Croix County Courts, St. Croix County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Nordstrand, Scott J and Dunlap, Stephen J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0259

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    St. Croix, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Nordstrand, Scott J

Dunlap, Stephen J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Saluri, Joseph B

Hudson, WI 54016

Respondent

Saluri, Lori L

Waukee, IA 50263

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Schwartz, Michael

Schwartz, Brandon

Respondent Attorneys

Avoles, Kathleen Robin

Stansbury, Carlton D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Direct Payment. Filed by Atty Avoles.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Cover letter, Subpoena, Notice of Deposition & witness check were served upon J I on behalf of J H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Dunlap, Stephen J.; Additional Text: Approving Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by SJD 11/26/21. ec: Attys.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation and Order; Court Official: Dunlap, Stephen J.; Additional Text: Signed by SJD 11/23/21. ec: Attys.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: for Protective Order. Filed by Atty Schwartz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Approving Stipulation for Protective Order. Filed by atty Schwartz. To SJD 11/24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Cover Letter to Commissioner Dunlap with Stipulation and proposed Order. To BLK 11/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. stipulation and prop. order; Additional Text: Filed by Atty Avoles. To SJD 11/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Decision and order; Court Official: Dunlap, Stephen J.; Additional Text: Signed by SJD 11/17/21. ec: Attys.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Supplemental order; Court Official: Dunlap, Stephen J.; Additional Text: Pursuant to the 9/15/21 hearing. Signed by SJD 11/17/21. ec: Attys, c: CSA.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Temporary order hearing on September 1, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Request; Additional Text: to reschedule the 8/24/21 hearing filed by Lori Saluri. To BLK 8/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: S&P, CPA and E Notice were served upon Lori Saluri 8/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: NMM & Affidavit were served upon Lori Saluri 8/6/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and petition; Additional Text: Filed by Atty Schwartz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $204.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 075237, Payable Number: 232061, Receipt Number: 21R 011335, Amount: $204.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion for temporary order; Additional Text: Filed by Atty Schwartz. Scheduled 8/24/21 @ 9:00 with SJD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit for temporary order; Additional Text: Filed by Atty Schwartz

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Avoles, Kathleen Robin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stansbury, Carlton D