This case was last updated from Sawyer County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 21:50:11 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of John Patrick Sommerfeldt and Olgui Angelik Sommerfeldt

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 In RE the marriage of John Patrick Sommerfeldt and Olgui Angelik Sommerfeldt was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Sawyer County Courts, Sawyer County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Yackel, John M, Lein, Susan and Cameron, Howard W., Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0008

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Sawyer, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Yackel, John M

Lein, Susan

Cameron, Howard W., Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sommerfeldt, John Patrick

Radisson, WI 54867

Respondent

Sommerfeldt, Olgui Angelik

Winter, WI 54896

Not Yet Classified

State of Wisconsin ex rel

10610 Main, Suite 115, C/O Sawyer County Csa

Hayward, WI 54843

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Eaton, Robert E

Respondent Attorney

Smith, Carla

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Duffy, Thomas J

Kelsey, Michael Arthur

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Location: Sawyer County Courthouse LCR; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for payment of GAL fees; Court Official: Cameron, Howard W., Jr.; Additional Text: $2048.81 to be split between parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for payment of GAL fees; Additional Text: $2,048.81

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter to Judge from GAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Objection; Additional Text: PE's letter of objection to exhibit filed on 12/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter to Judge from RE's Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on February 2, 2022 at 02:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter to Judge from PE's Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Sommerfeldt, John Patrick; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for John Patrick Sommerfeldt Current: 3593 N Highland Ave., Apt. 5, Radisson, WI 54867 United States (Effective: 03-15-2021) Prior: 5374 Aldridge Lake Road, Borrie Road Couderay Township, Eagle River, WI 54521 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: Personal Service on Olgui A. Sommerfeldt on 2/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Additional Text: With Minor Children (Temporary Order Hearing on 3/29/2021 at 1:00 p.m.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of appearance as real party in interest; Additional Text: State of Wisconsin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Temporary order hearing on March 29, 2021 at 01:00 pm. (not mailed because there is a Notice of Hearing included on the Order to Show Cause)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Parent education class; Additional Text: Order for Attendance at Parent Education Classes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit for temporary order; Additional Text: Affidavit to Show Cause and Request for Hearing for Temporary Order with Minor Children (e-mailed Affidavit to FCC office for scheduling of TOH - 2/18 cg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Additional Text: $194.50 paid (Cash)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelsey, Michael Arthur

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duffy, Thomas J