This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 01/27/2022 at 06:53:12 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Jennifer Lee DeVries and Jason James DeVries

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 In RE the marriage of Jennifer Lee DeVries and Jason James DeVries was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Voigt, W. Andrew and Von Hoff, Andrea E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0100

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Voigt, W. Andrew

Von Hoff, Andrea E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DeVries, Jennifer Lee

Columbus, WI 53925

Respondent

DeVries, Jason James

Columbus, WI 53925

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rhode, Tim R

Respondent Attorney

Smiley, William A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. temporary order; Additional Text: Stipulated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: Von Hoff, Andrea E; Additional Text: Stipulated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004549, Payable Number: 159578, Receipt Number: 21R 008236, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Smiley for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: The hearing set for June 8, 2021 is off, stipulation reached per Attorney Smiley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: Jason DeVries - June 1, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004196, Payable Number: 159235, Amount: $214.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Custody Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Child Support Guidelines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit for temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order to show cause; Additional Text: June 8, 2021 at 2:30 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause; Court Official: Von Hoff, Andrea E; Additional Text: June 8, 2021 at 2:30 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smiley, William A