This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 01/27/2022 at 01:33:46 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Jared Guess and Anastasia Guess

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 In RE the marriage of Jared Guess and Anastasia Guess was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Bitney, J. M and Stewart, Katherine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0104

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Bitney, J. M

Stewart, Katherine

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Guess, Jared

Cumberland, WI 54829

Guess, Anastasia

Montpelier, ND 58472

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Guess, Anastasia; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Anastasia Guess Current: 421 2nd Street Box 52, 108 4th Avenue, Montpelier, ND 58472 United States (Effective: 05-10-2021) Prior: 421 2nd Street Box 52, Montpelier, ND 58472 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: Stewart, Katherine; Court Reporter: DAR; Additional Text: 09:30 AM Joint Petitioner Jared Guess appeared by zoom phone means. Joint Petitioner Anastasia Guess appeared by zoom video means. 9:30 am Court relates. 9:33 am Both parties called and sworn. 9:34 am Jared Guess called and questioned by FCC. Not in the military. No children born or adopted into marriage. No real estate. 16' Boat/trailer and debt - Jared Personal loan - Jared Maintenance is waived. Personal property has been divided. 2006 GMC - Jared US Bank - Jared Debts have been divided. No equalization payment. 9:40 am Anastasia Guess called and questioned by FCC. Not in the military. Wife is not pregnant. 2013 Ford and debt - Anastasia Gate bank accounts - Anastasia Maintenance is waived. No equalization payment. All previous taxes have been filed. Spouse may use surname/maiden name of: Peltzer 9:45 am Testimony closed. 9:45 am Court finds marriage is irretrievably broken, notice requirements have been met and the Court has jurisdiction. Court finds the Marital Settlement Agreement is fair and reasonable and adopts. Court grants Judgment of divorce. Admonitions given. Spouse may use surname/maiden name of: Peltzer Court will prepare findings.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet; Additional Text: The original Divorce/Annulment Worksheet prepared and will be in next mailing to the Bureau of Vital Statistics.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law; Court Official: Stewart, Katherine; Additional Text: Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment w/ Marital Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation - Before Trial; Court Official: Stewart, Katherine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Parties mailed a certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment w/ Marital Settlement Agreement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Family Court Commissioner Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: First hearing - FCC; Court Official: Stewart, Katherine; Court Reporter: Disc; Additional Text: Minute sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated Divorce Hearing on September 28, 2021 at 09:25 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: First hearing - FCC on June 15, 2021 at 09:20 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Notice of Pre-Trial Conference and Temporary Hearing set for 6/15/2021 at 9:20 am before FCC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint Petition without Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Jared Guess

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Anastasia Guess

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: 21R 003742

    Read MoreRead Less