This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 08:34:25 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of James Troy Davis and Carla Rose Davis

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 In RE the marriage of James Troy Davis and Carla Rose Davis was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Fredrickson, Jon E, Herrera, Georgia L and Flancher, Faye M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0019

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Fredrickson, Jon E

Herrera, Georgia L

Flancher, Faye M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Davis, James Troy

Racine, WI 53404

Respondent

Davis, Carla Rose

Racine, WI 53404

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Clausen, Jillian Elise

Respondent Attorney

Johnson, Matthew P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Flancher, Faye M.; Location: Br 8 - Courthouse - 3rd Floor Courtroom; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling conference; Court Official: Herrera, Georgia L.; Additional Text: James Davis in person with Atty Clausen. Carla Davis in court with Atty Johnson. BTC: Parties shall consider a financial mediator. Parties to file updated FDS, list of witnesses and summaries of disputed issues by 2/4/22. Set before BR 8 CCJ. See commissioner's order for details.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Adjournment request for 9/7/21 hearing received by Family Court. Commissioner Herrera for review/approval status. Adjournment request approved for 9/7/21 hearing. Both attorney's office to conference call family court office for a new date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: First hearing - FCC; Court Official: Herrera, Georgia L.; Additional Text: 08:37 AM Petitioner James Troy Davis in court with attorney Jillian Elise Clausen. Respondent Carla Rose Davis in court with attorney Matthew P. Johnson. No minor children. Temporary Order entered. Maintenance Held Open. Scheduling conference scheduled for September 7, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: Herrera, Georgia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent; Additional Text: Wife

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner; Additional Text: Husband

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Response and counterclaim; Additional Text: Response and Counterclaim - filed by Atty Matt Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order assigning judge/judicial assignment order; Court Official: Flancher, Faye M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of assignment of judge

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001644, Payable Number: 424923, Receipt Number: 21R 000628F, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Johnson for Carla Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Request for substitution; Additional Text: filed by Atty Matt Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause for temporary order; Court Official: Herrera, Georgia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000655, Payable Number: 424440, Receipt Number: 21R 000336F, Amount: $214.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit and order to show cause; Court Official: Herrera, Georgia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order to show cause for temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Johnson, Matthew P.