This case was last updated from Manitowoc County Courts on 01/29/2022 at 15:49:21 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Greg Michael Kornowske and Stacy Sue Kornowske

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 In RE the marriage of Greg Michael Kornowske and Stacy Sue Kornowske was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Manitowoc County Courts, Manitowoc County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Dewane, Robert and LeFevre, C. Luke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0274

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Manitowoc, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Dewane, Robert

LeFevre, C. Luke

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kornowske, Greg Michael

Reedsville, WI 54230

Respondent

Kornowske, Stacy Sue

Reedsville, WI 54230

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Vesely, Lawrence Gerard

Respondent Attorney

Parks, Daniel L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Dewane, Robert; Location: Manitowoc County Courthouse, Br. 3, Rm. 212; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: LeFevre, C. Luke

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial order; Court Official: Dewane, Robert; Additional Text: Scheduled on 05-26-2022 at 1:45 PM in Branch 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order hearing; Court Official: LeFevre, C. Luke; Court Reporter: Tape Machine; Additional Text: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 206459, Payable Number: 152095, Receipt Number: 21R 015450, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: of Attorney Daniel Parks by Stacy Kornowske

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Temporary order hearing on December 15, 2021 at 03:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Summons and Petition, etc. served on Stacy Kornowske on 11-11-2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition without Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 206098, Payable Number: 151814, Receipt Number: 21R 014929, Amount: $214.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit for temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order to show cause for temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum; Additional Text: Signed by Greg Kornowske.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause for temporary order; Court Official: LeFevre, C. Luke; Additional Text: set for 11-23-2021 at 3:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Parks, Daniel L.