This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 11:10:37 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of George Valentine Webb and Danielle Nicole Webb

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In RE the marriage of George Valentine Webb and Danielle Nicole Webb was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hue, William F and Hartley, Brian C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0083

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hue, William F

Hartley, Brian C

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Webb, George Valentine

Watertown, WI 53094

Webb, Danielle Nicole

Watertown, WI 53098

Evjc, Danielle Nicole

Watertown, WI 53098

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 017261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Hartley, Brian C.; Additional Text: of Divorce pc IVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation - Before Trial; Court Official: Hartley, Brian C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: A true copy of the Judgment in this action which was entered on 9/9/21 was mailed to each of the parties hereto at their last known addresses on 9/9/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: Hartley, Brian C.; Court Reporter: Unmonitored DAR; Additional Text: [NMS] case called at 3:00pm Joint Petitioner George Valentine Webb in court. Joint Petitioner Danielle Nicole Webb in court. Joint Petitioner George Valentine Webb-sworn & testifies --examination by the Court --address given: 204 East Haven Drive, Watertown, WI 53094 Joint Petitioner Danielle Nicole Webb-sworn & testifies --examination by the Court --address given: 1301 Allwardt St., Apt. 8H, Watertown, WI 53098 The Court grants Judgment of Divorce to the Joint-Petitioners; the Marital Settlement Agreement filed 09/07/2021 is approved and is to be incorporated in the Judgment. Maintenance is waived by both parties Joint Petitioner Wife is restored to her former surname: Evje Admonitions to be mailed to the parties (no return requested) The Court drafted the Divorce Worksheet at the time of hearing The Court drafted the FOF-COL-JOD at the time of hearing recess 3:13pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement; Additional Text: FCC Approved on 09/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: -George Webb.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated divorce pre-trial conference; Court Official: Hartley, Brian C.; Court Reporter: Unmonitored DAR; Additional Text: hearing on 07/28/2021- (HARTLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated divorce pre-trial conference on September 7, 2021 at 03:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated divorce pre-trial conference on July 28, 2021 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: -Jt. Pet. Danielle Webb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: 21R 006292

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint Petition without Minor Children; Additional Text: PC: IVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Additional Text: via allpaid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling order; Court Official: Hartley, Brian C.

    Read MoreRead Less