This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 01/29/2022 at 21:04:16 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Elizabeth K'lynn Ford and Derek Andrew Ford

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 In RE the marriage of Elizabeth K'lynn Ford and Derek Andrew Ford was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Dillon, Daniel T and Kolpien, Thomas A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0735

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Dillon, Daniel T

Kolpien, Thomas A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ford, Elizabeth K'lynn

Janesville, WI 53545

Respondent

Ford, Derek Andrew

Beloit, WI 53511

Not Yet Classified

State of Wisconsin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Annen, Jennifer E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for mediation; Court Official: Kolpien, Thomas A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Respondent Derek Ford's pay stubs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Interim financial summary to child supt agency; Additional Text: Hearing held on January 18, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause hearing; Court Official: Kolpien, Thomas A.; Additional Text: Court conducted via Zoom: 09:46 AM Petitioner Elizabeth K'lynn Ford appeared by video means. Respondent Derek Andrew Ford appeared by video means. Attorney Patricia Zamba appeared by video means for Child Support Agency State of Wisconsin at 10:03 am. Request for Temporary Orders. Parties agree to equal shared placement; week on week off. Exchanges to be done at 4:00 pm on Sundays at Jake's Mobile on Highway 51. Court orders mediation. Standard restraining orders. Court denies Petitioner Elizabeth K'lynn Ford's request for spousal support. Parties to equally split variable expenses and uninsured medical expenses. No child support order. Court to submit the order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Kolpien, Thomas A.; Additional Text: Activity: Order to show cause hearing Appearances by video/zoom: Court Official, Court Reporter, Court Clerk, and all Parties referenced in hearing minutes as in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Petitioner Elizabeth Ford's Wage statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Petitioner Elizabeth Ford's Tax return 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Petitioner Elizabeth Ford's Tax return 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Petitioner Elizabeth Ford's Wage statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Petitioner Elizabeth Ford's Wage statement

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order to show cause for temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed marital settlement with minor children; Additional Text: Petitioner: Elizabeth K'lynn Ford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $194.5; Additional Text: 21R 035931

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit for temporary order; Additional Text: Petitioner Elizabeth Ford, filed without supporting documents

    Read MoreRead Less