This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 09:39:27 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Diana Welker and Claude Welker

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 In RE the marriage of Diana Welker and Claude Welker was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Milisauskas, Anthony, Pfeuffer, Elizabeth and Gabriele, Angelina. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0023

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Milisauskas, Anthony

Pfeuffer, Elizabeth

Gabriele, Angelina

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Welker, Diana

Kansasville, WI 53139

Respondent

Welker, Claude

Union Grove, WI 53182

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

Anderson, Benjamin T.

Ward, John Anthony

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 027269

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Qualified domestic relations order; Court Official: Gabriele, Angelina; Additional Text: GE Retirement savings plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: QDRO sent to Br. 6 for approval w/ 1 copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Gabriele, Angelina

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default divorce; Court Official: Milisauskas, Anthony; Court Reporter: Cohen-Rojas, Deborah; Additional Text: 9:04 - 9:15. Respondent Claude Welker in court. Petitioner Diana Welker in court. Clerk C. Pflug. The parties are reach to proceed with a final hearing. Parties sworn in and testified. Court grants divorce. Marital Settlement agreement approved and incorporated. Maintenance denied to both parties. Wife may resume restoration of former legal surname of Atkins. Judgment entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Pfeuffer, Elizabeth; Additional Text: Copies mailed to parties and CSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Pfeuffer, Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: FFCLJ, Parties' Approval of FFCLJ, MSA, and Worksheet sent to Commissioner Pfeuffer. No SASE provided.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Temporary order hearing on March 2, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 053937, Payable Number: 315058, Receipt Number: 21R 001214, Amount: $214.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit for temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order to show cause for temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Uniform child custody affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Pfeuffer Tab

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice and order; Court Official: Milisauskas, Anthony; Additional Text: Parenting Education Class on 2-11-21 at 5:30pm - Zoom Instructions attached

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ward, John Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anderson, Benjamin T.