This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 01/29/2022 at 21:05:51 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Cyiah McKauley Wright and Cole Robert McKay

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 In RE the marriage of Cyiah McKauley Wright and Cole Robert McKay was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Martens, Todd K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0451

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Martens, Todd K

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wright, Cyiah McKauley

West Bend, WI 53090

Respondent

McKay, Cole Robert

West Bend, WI 53090

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brunner, Mark J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: Evidentiary hearing; Court Official: Martens, Todd K.; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 2244 (262)335-4341; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: to Cole Robert McKay 1/8/22 re: Electronic Filing Notice, Summons without minor children, petition for annulment or divorce without minor children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: to Cole McKay re: 2/14/22 hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Per request of Atty. Mark Brunner, evidentiary hearing on issue of annulment scheduled for 2-14-2022 at 2:30 p.m. Atty. Brunner to send notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter received from Atty Brunner to Branch III re: requesting hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition without Minor Children; Additional Text: Summons and Petition for Annulment or Divorce without Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $204.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 192593, Payable Number: 161778, Receipt Number: 21R 023047, Amount: $204.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: in Support of Annulment

    Read MoreRead Less