This case was last updated from Marathon County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 04:45:51 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Collette Catherine Perez and Daniel Lezcano Concepcion

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 In RE the marriage of Collette Catherine Perez and Daniel Lezcano Concepcion was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Marathon County Courts, Marathon County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Moran, Michael K, Corbett, Scott M and Marcus, Sandra J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0102

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Marathon, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Moran, Michael K

Corbett, Scott M

Marcus, Sandra J

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Perez, Collette Catherine

Weston, WI 54476

Concepcion, Daniel Lezcano

Wausau, WI 54401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.; Court Reporter: Tape recorder; Additional Text: Clerk: Becca. Case Called: 2:07 pm. Joint Petitioner Collette Perez appears in person, pro se. Joint Petitioner Daniel Concepcion appears in person, pro se. Collette Perez sworn and testifies. Daniel Concepcion sworn and testifies. No minor children. Wife is not currently pregnant. Maintenance is waived by both parties except for debt repayment Wife does not wish to resume surname/maiden name. Husband does not wish to resume surname/maiden name. Neither party is an active member of the military service. The marriage is irretrievably broken. Facts alleged in petition are true and correct and juris. stats. met; Marital Settlement Agreement is approved and incorporated into the Findings of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Judgment of Divorce. COURT advises parties of remarriage warning. Divorce granted. BVS filed. Judgment signed. Copies given to both parties. Adj: 2:16 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.; Additional Text: of divorce signed 8/18/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner; Additional Text: JP-Wife's (conf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent; Additional Text: JP-Husband's (conf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated Divorce Hearing on August 18, 2021 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Corbett, Scott M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of assignment of judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Date/Time set for stipulated divorce hearing. Both parties appear. Paperwork is incomplete. Parties to update and reschedule.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint Petition without Minor Children; Additional Text: for divorce w/Marital Property Agreement (conf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: 21R 003463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum; Additional Text: (conf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for appearance; Court Official: Moran, Michael K.; Additional Text: Scheduling Order dated 3/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less