This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 23:57:50 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Clare Louise Schirmer and William Fancis Schirmer

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 In RE the marriage of Clare Louise Schirmer and William Fancis Schirmer was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Bjerke, Todd W and Wright, Elizabeth A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0055

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Bjerke, Todd W

Wright, Elizabeth A

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Schirmer, Clare Louise

La Crosse, WI 54601

Schirmer, William Fancis

Lacey, WA 98516

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Doyle, Steven Patrick

Norland, Daniel Mark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: cancelled - agreement reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Wright, Elizabeth A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation for temporary order; Court Official: Wright, Elizabeth A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: JP Wife

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: for temporary order - hearing w/ FCC on November 18, 2021 at 1:30 p.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: for temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008149, Payable Number: 186579, Receipt Number: 21R 013317, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: JP Husband

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: FFCLJ filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: JP Husband

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Financial Settlement Accompanying the Divorce Filing between parties filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: noticed page 2 of JP Wife's FDS is missing page 2 - called her this date and left voicemail requested amended FDS to include page 2/ch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: FFCLJ & Divorce/Annulment Worksheet filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Schirmer, William Fancis; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for William Fancis Schirmer Current: 2692 London Loop NE, Lacey, WA 98516 United States (Effective: 06-24-2021) Prior: 1330 Shorewood Dr, La Crosse, WI 54601 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: JP Wife

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint Petition without Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norland, Daniel Mark

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Doyle, Steven Patrick