This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 11:04:30 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Brijeshkumar Maheshkumar Patel and Ashley Conaway

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In RE the marriage of Brijeshkumar Maheshkumar Patel and Ashley Conaway was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Aprahamian, Michael J, Domina, William J and Sinitz, Linda M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0328

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Aprahamian, Michael J

Domina, William J

Sinitz, Linda M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Patel, Brijeshkumar Maheshkumar

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Respondent

Conaway, Ashley

Decatur, IL 62521

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bobot, Vincent Joseph

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: Domina, William J.; Location: Parties to appear remotely via Zoom.; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent; Additional Text: as to Ashley Conaway, filed by Atty Vincent Bobot.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner; Additional Text: filed by Atty Vincent Bobot on behalf of Brijeshkumar Patel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Sinitz, Linda M.; Court Reporter: Recorded Hearing; Additional Text: 01:57 PM Petitioner Brijeshkumar Maheshkumar Patel appeared by video means with Attorney Vincent Joseph Bobot. Respondent Ashley Conaway appeared by video means. All parties have agreed that some may have the hearing conducted remotely. This hearing has met the statutory standards for video conferencing. Attorney Bobot requests a new date and that the children born in the marriage are not Mr. Patels. Court informs Attorney Bobot that the children will need to go to a paternity test and a GAL will be requested. Judge will have to appoint if ordered. Court sets matter over to Judges calendar and notes financial disclosure statements have not been filed and orders them be filed within 10 days. Status conference scheduled for March 14, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Sinitz, Linda M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on March 14, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on January 7, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Domina, William J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of assignment of judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial order; Court Official: Aprahamian, Michael J.; Court Reporter: Schiek, Lori; Additional Text: and pretrial checklist.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Aprahamian, Michael J.; Additional Text: VACATED 8/17/21 - Signed by Judge Michael J. Aprahamian on 7/27/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children; Additional Text: for Divorce, filed by Atty Vincent J. Bobot.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $204.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 012005, Payable Number: 432859, Receipt Number: 21R 012969, Amount: $204.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner; Additional Text: for Brijeshkumar Maheshkumar Patel, filed by Atty Vincent J. Bobot.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: filed by Atty Vincent J. Bobot.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Patel, Brijeshkumar Maheshkumar; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Brijeshkumar Maheshkumar Patel Current: 1505 S. Coachlight Drive, Apt 19, New Berlin, WI 53151 US (Effective: 03-26-2021) Prior: 1505 S. Coachlight Drive, Apartment #19, New Berlin, WI 53151 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: To Defendant's Cause of Action and Counterclaims, filed by Atty Vincent Bobot.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bobot, Vincent Joseph