This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 16:49:49 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Brianne Renae Link and Kraig Fredrick Link

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 In RE the marriage of Brianne Renae Link and Kraig Fredrick Link was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Babler, James C and Stewart, Katherine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0081

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Babler, James C

Stewart, Katherine

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Link, Brianne Renae

Prairie Farm, WI 54762

Link, Kraig Fredrick

Ridgeland, WI 54763

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Additional Text: Order on Stipulation to change physical placement and child support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Copy of Order on Stipulation to change physical placement and child support and Stipulation to change physical placement and child support mailed to both parties and sent to CSA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: Stipulation to change physical placement and child support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Proposed Order on Stipulation to change physical placement and child support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Link, Brianne Renae; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Brianne Renae Link Current: 796 1st Avenue, Prairie Farm, WI 54762 United States (Effective: 12-29-2021) Prior: 1138 9th Avenue, Hillsdale, WI 54733

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: Stewart, Katherine; Court Reporter: DAR; Additional Text: 09:28 AM Joint Petitioner Kraig Fredrick Link appeared by zoom video means. Joint Petitioner Brianne Renae Link appeared by zoom video means. 9:28 am Court relates. 9:28 am Both parties called and sworn. 9:28 am Brianne Link called and questioned by court. Not in the military. Wife is not pregnant. 2 children born into the marriage. Maintenance is waived. Personal Property has been divided. 2016 Fiat 500 and debt - Brianne 2016 Ram 1500 and debt - Kraig WI trust fund acct - Brianne Vanguard homedepot - Brianne Vanguard current accenture - Kraig Firearms are divided. Tools - Kraig Each party to keep own bank accounts. Money in Joint account will be transferred to Brianne. All previous years taxes have been filed. Marital home and debt - Kraig - will be refinanced to remove Brianne. Debts have been divided. Equalization payment will be $115,000, payable from Kraig to Brianne - to be made by 10/17/2021. Joint Legal custody and shared physical placement for both children. Brianne Link will carry children on health insurance. Uninsured medical will be paid 100% by Kraig Link. Child support will be $755 bi-monthly, payable by Kraig to Brianne. Parties will split variable cost 50/50. Each party will claim one child each year for taxes. 9:40 am Kraig Link called and questioned by FCC. Not in the military. Maintenance is waived. 9:47 am Court relates. 9:48 am Testimony closed. 9:48 am Court finds marriage is irretrievably broken, notice requirements have been met and the Court has jurisdiction. Court finds the Marital Settlement Agreement is fair and reasonable and adopts. Court grants Judgment of divorce. Admonitions given.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Babler, James C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Stewart, Katherine; Additional Text: Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment w/ Marital Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation - Before Trial; Court Official: Stewart, Katherine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Parties mailed a certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment w/ Marital Settlement Agreement.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Kraig Link

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Brianne Link

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: First hearing - FCC on May 18, 2021 at 03:10 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Notice of Pre-Trial Conference and Temporary Hearing set for 5/18/2021 at 3:10 pm before FCC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint Petition with Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons/petition w/ child support or maint request; Amount: $194.5; Additional Text: 21R 003000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed parenting plan; Additional Text: Brianne Link

    Read MoreRead Less