This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 01/27/2022 at 17:02:54 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Amy Marie Salberg and Emory Kent Salberg Sr.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 In RE the marriage of Amy Marie Salberg and Emory Kent Salberg Sr was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott, Susan K, Muehlbauer, James K and Giernoth, Sandra J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0236

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Scott, Susan K

Muehlbauer, James K

Giernoth, Sandra J

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Stansbury, Carlton D

Milwaukee, WI 53224

Salberg, Amy Marie

Jackson, WI 53037

Salberg, Emory Kent, Sr.

West Bend, WI 53095

Bentley, Amy M

Jackson, WI 53037

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Muehlbauer, James K; Additional Text: on stipulation amending judgment of divorce (copies mailed to parties)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: to amend judgment of divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Muehlbauer, James K; Additional Text: Amending Judgment of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet; Additional Text: Divorce/Annulment Worksheet sent to State Vital Records Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: Scott, Susan K; Court Reporter: Digital Audio Recording; Additional Text: 10:28 AM Joint Petitioner Amy Marie Salberg appeared in court, Joint Petitioner Emory Kent Salberg Sr. appeared in court. Witnesses, joint petitioners sworn and testified; Court places findings on the record, Marital Settlement Agreement is approved and incorporated in Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment. Spouse reserves the right to use of surname/maiden name of Bentley. Divorce granted. e10:47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Scott, Susan K; Additional Text: (cert. copies to parties at counter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation - Before Trial; Court Official: Scott, Susan K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Stipulated divorce hearing scheduled December 29, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. w/ SKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated Divorce Hearing on December 29, 2021 at 10:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Joint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Parties Approval of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for specific judicial assign approved; Court Official: Giernoth, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order assigning judge/judicial assignment order; Court Official: Muehlbauer, James K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint Petition with Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 097741, Payable Number: 157242, Receipt Number: 21R 013229, Amount: $214.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less