This case was last updated from Manitowoc County Courts on 01/29/2022 at 13:31:59 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Abigail A. Miller and Jonathan S. DeBauch

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 In RE the marriage of Abigail A Miller and Jonathan S DeBauch was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Manitowoc County Courts, Manitowoc County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are LeFevre, C. Luke and Dietz, Jerilyn M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0270

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Manitowoc, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

LeFevre, C. Luke

Dietz, Jerilyn M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Miller, Abigail A.

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Respondent

DeBauch, Jonathan S.

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Not Yet Classified

Manitowoc County Child Support Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Pozorski, Joseph Michael, Jr.

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Belair, Sarah E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Dietz, Jerilyn M.; Location: Manitowoc County Courthouse, Br. 2, Room 218; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: LeFevre, C. Luke; Additional Text: to Attend Parenting Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial order; Court Official: Dietz, Jerilyn M.; Additional Text: Scheduled on 05-20-2022 at 10:15 AM in Branch 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: LeFevre, C. Luke

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order hearing; Court Official: LeFevre, C. Luke; Court Reporter: Tape Machine; Additional Text: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Summons and Petition, etc. served on Jonathan S. Debauch on 11-24-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Notice of Appearance, mailed to Joseph Pozorski, Jr., and Jonathan Debauch, on 11/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: by Attorney Sarah Belair for the State of Wisconsin Manitowoc County Child Support Agency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order to show cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause for temporary order; Court Official: LeFevre, C. Luke; Additional Text: set for 12-01-2021 at 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit for temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 205795, Payable Number: 151628, Receipt Number: 21R 014495, Amount: $214.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum; Additional Text: Signed by Abigail Miller.

    Read MoreRead Less