This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 01/26/2022 at 10:11:41 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Abby L. Gottschall and Mark W Gottschall

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 In RE the marriage of Abby L Gottschall and Mark W Gottschall was filed as a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Day, Craig R and Heenan, Douglas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0138

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Day, Craig R

Heenan, Douglas

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gottschall, Abby L.

Platteville, WI 53818

Respondent

Gottschall, Mark W

Platteville, WI 53818

Not Yet Classified

State of Wisconsin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Reinicke, Eric Donald

Respondent Attorney

Schulz, Michael J

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Wood, Benjamin R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Day, Craig R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Legal separation granted; Court Official: Day, Craig R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Hearing on annulment or separation; Court Official: Day, Craig R; Court Reporter: Wiest, Nichole; Additional Text: Clerk's minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of mailing; Additional Text: judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Parenting education class petitioner/plaintiff; Additional Text: Certificate of Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated Divorce Hearing on December 15, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone scheduling conference on November 16, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated Divorce Hearing on November 16, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: SOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Gottschall, Abby L.; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Abby L. Gottschall Current: 1516 DeValera Drive #103, Platteville, WI 53818 United States (Effective: 04-07-2021) Prior: 1210 Union Street, Platteville, WI 53818 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Auth. SaP etc on resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion for temporary order; Additional Text: Amended (FCC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Day, Craig R; Additional Text: to Attend Program on Effects of Divorce on Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $214.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002322, Payable Number: 144406, Amount: $214.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion for temporary order; Additional Text: and affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wood, Benjamin R.