This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 02/09/2022 at 04:52:21 (UTC).

Home Care United Inc. d/b/a SSM Health At Home vs. Juan C. Marrero and Jackie Marrero

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Home Care United Inc d/b/a SSM Health At Home filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Juan C Marrero and Jackie Marrero. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamre Incha, Cindy, Hue, William F and Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0899

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hamre Incha, Cindy

Hue, William F

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Home Care United Inc., D/B/A SSM Health At Home

4639 Hammersley Road

Madison, WI 53711

Defendants

Marrero, Juan C.

Whitewater, WI 53190

Marrero, Jackie

Whitewater, WI 53190

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peterson, Ryan M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 022243, Payable Number: 188582, Receipt Number: 22R 001001, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: JEFFERSON; Case number: 2021SC000899; Caption: Home Care United Inc. d/b/a SSM Health At Home vs. Juan C. Marrero and Jackie Marrero; Total Amount: $1770.84; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Home Care United Inc., D/B/A SSM Health At Home; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 4639 Hammersley Road, Madison, WI 53711 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Juan C. Marrero; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1124 Bloomingfield Drive, Apt 7, Whitewater, WI 53190 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jackie Marrero; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1124 Bloomingfield Drive, Apt 7, Whitewater, WI 53190 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1403.89; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $97.45; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Attorney Ryan Peterson, requesting to appear by telephone on this date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Court Reporter: Unmonitored DAR; Additional Text: [MK] Attorney Ryan M. Peterson appears by telphone for Plaintiff Home Care United Inc. d/b/a SSM Health At Home. Defendant Juan C. Marrero not in court. Defendant Jackie Marrero not in court. On Motion of Attorney Peterson, the Court grants Default Judgment in favor of the Plaintiff for the Claim amount of $1,403.89 plus costs and fees -- conditioned on the filing of an Affidavit of No Answer within thirty days. If this affidavit is not timely filed, this case will be dismissed without further notice or hearing. Review scheduled for February 7, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of no answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hamre Incha, Cindy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of publication; Amount: $22.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: for 1/5/22 Return Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Court Reporter: Unmonitored DAR; Additional Text: [MK] Attorney Ryan M. Peterson in court for Plaintiff Home Care United Inc. Defendants Juan C Marrero and Jackie Marrero do not appear. On Motion of Attorney Peterson, the Court adjourns to January 5th for publication. Return date scheduled for January 5, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $55.0; Additional Text: Juan Marrero was not served (S&C).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Jackie Marrero was not served (S&C).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $1403.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 218677, Payable Number: 186621, Receipt Number: 21R 020123, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peterson, Ryan M.