This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 06:51:48 (UTC).

Hess Memorial Hospital Inc. vs. WILLIAM R FOSBINDER et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Hess Memorial Hospital Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAM R FOSBINDER. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kujak, Angela and Lowe, Lori J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0622

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kujak, Angela

Lowe, Lori J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hess Memorial Hospital Inc.

1050 Division St.

Mauston, WI 53948

Defendants

FOSBINDER, WILLIAM R

Mauston, WI 53948

FOSBINDER, KRISTINE

Mauston, WI 53948

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salna, Vytas P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 107939, Payable Number: 129254, Receipt Number: 21R 008562, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Lowe, Lori J.; Additional Text: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: JUNEAU; Case number: 2021SC000622; Caption: Hess Memorial Hospital Inc. vs. WILLIAM R FOSBINDER et al; Total Amount: $3353.35; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: WILLIAM R FOSBINDER; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 420 W STATE ST, Mauston, WI 53948 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: KRISTINE FOSBINDER; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 420 W STATE ST, Mauston, WI 53948 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Hess Memorial Hospital Inc.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1050 Division St., Mauston, WI 53948 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $3079.85; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $4.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-12-06; Type: Amended judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Court Reporter: Tape Recorder; Additional Text: Attorney Vytas P. Salna in court by letter for Plaintiff Hess Memorial Hospital Inc.. Defendant KRISTINE FOSBINDER not in court. Defendant WILLIAM R FOSBINDER not in court. COURT: Default Judgment plus statutory costs/attorney fees were granted to Plaintiff against Defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Additional Text: On 9-28-2021 authenticated copies of the Summons and Complaint were mailed to Defendants and E-filed to Bonded Collectors.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 088182, Payable Number: 128290, Receipt Number: 21R 007026, Amount: $118.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: WILLIAM R FOSBINDER & KRISTINE FOSBINDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: FILED BY ATTY SALNA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Salna, Vytas P.