This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 21:23:22 (UTC).

Hess Memorial Hospital Inc. vs. STEPHANIE D GRIMM

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Hess Memorial Hospital Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEPHANIE D GRIMM. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kujak, Angela and Smith, Stacy A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0171

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kujak, Angela

Smith, Stacy A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hess Memorial Hospital Inc.

1050 Division St.

Mauston, WI 53948

Defendant

GRIMM, STEPHANIE D

Mauston, WI 53948

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salna, Vytas P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 058549, Payable Number: 126776, Receipt Number: 21R 004587, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.; Additional Text: Amended ...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: JUNEAU; Case number: 2021SC000171; Caption: Hess Memorial Hospital Inc. vs. STEPHANIE D GRIMM; Total Amount: $10421.5; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Hess Memorial Hospital Inc.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1050 Division St., Mauston, WI 53948 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: STEPHANIE D GRIMM; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 227 TREMONT ST, Mauston, WI 53948 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $10000.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $300.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-06-14; Type: Amended judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summary Judgment Hearing; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.; Court Reporter: Michalewicz, Mary; Additional Text: 10:18 AM Attorney Vytas P. Salna in court by phone. Defendant STEPHANIE D GRIMM in court. COURT: Summary Judgment granted. Judgment plus statutory costs/attorney fees were granted to Plaintiff against Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment after motion; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: FILED BY ATTY SALNA. CLERK MAILED OUT COPY OF THIS WITH AFFIDAVIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: OF ATTY SALNA

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on July 13, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Court Reporter: Tape Recorder; Additional Text: 02:44 PM Attorney Vytas P. Salna in court by letter for Plaintiff Hess Memorial Hospital Inc.. Defendant STEPHANIE D GRIMM appears by Zoom and disputes the case. COURT: Matter contested. Set for Court Trial. CC told Defendant to file an Answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Contested; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Court Reporter: Tape Recorder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Additional Text: On 3-15-2021 authenticated copies of the Summons and Complaint were mailed to Defendant and E-filed to Bonded Collectors.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 029269, Payable Number: 125414, Receipt Number: 21R 002016, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: FILED BY ATTY SALNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: STEPHANIE D GRIMM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on April 12, 2021 at 12:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Salna, Vytas P.