This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 13:09:10 (UTC).

Hess Memorial Hospital Inc. vs. ERIC R BRZEZINSKI

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Hess Memorial Hospital Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERIC R BRZEZINSKI. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Kujak, Angela. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0151

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Kujak, Angela

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hess Memorial Hospital Inc.

1050 Division St.

Mauston, WI 53948

Defendant

BRZEZINSKI, ERIC R

Wonewoc, WI 53968

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salna, Vytas P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of dismissal; Additional Text: FILED BY BONDED COLLECTORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: MATTER ADJOURNED TO 4/26/21 FOR PAYMENT TO CLEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on April 26, 2021 at 12:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: MATTER ADJOURNED TO 4/12/21 FOR PAYMENT IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on April 12, 2021 at 12:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on March 29, 2021 at 12:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Additional Text: On 3-1-2021 authenticated copies of the Summons and Complaint were mailed to Defendant and E-filed to Bonded Collectors.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 019653, Payable Number: 125211, Receipt Number: 21R 001474, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: FILED BY ATTY SALNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: ERIC R BRZEZINSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Salna, Vytas P.