This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 16:30:30 (UTC).

Heights Finance Corp vs. Steven E. Schmidt

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Heights Finance Corp filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Steven E Schmidt. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Wickler, Jody R, Horne, Scott L, Gonzalez, Ramona A, Veenstra, Joseph G, Doyle, Gloria L and Kohnert, Ruth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0776

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Wickler, Jody R

Horne, Scott L

Gonzalez, Ramona A

Veenstra, Joseph G

Doyle, Gloria L

Kohnert, Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heights Finance Corp

605 2Nd Ave S., Suite 120

Onalaska, WI 54650

Defendant

Schmidt, Steven E.

West Allis, WI 53219

Garnishee

Sounds on Wheels

Milwaukee, WI 53215

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Doyle, Gloria L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Garnishment hearing; Court Official: Doyle, Gloria L.; Court Reporter: Veres, Sue; Additional Text: 09:45 AM Plaintiff Heights Finance Corp appeared by phone means by Wendy Gangen. Defendant Steven E. Schmidt appeared by phone means. Garnishee Sounds on Wheels not in court. Zoom hearing Gangen - Nothing further has been filed by def Schmidt - I will be filing bankruptcy. Working part-time and receive state assistance. Gangen - Would like garnishment to continue until he has a case number for the bankruptcy. We haven't received any proof. CT: Motion granted. Garnishment to continue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Garnishment hearing on January 7, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Court Official: Kohnert, Ruth; Additional Text: Gloria Doyle is inviting you to a scheduled Zoom meeting on 1/7/22 at 9:30 am. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS ABOUT HOW TO ATTEND THIS HEARING VIA ZOOM, EITHER BY AUDIO OR VIDEO, PLEASE LEAVE A VOICEMAIL AT (608) 785-5880 AND WE WILL GET BACK TO YOU WITHIN 24 HOURS. Topic: BRANCH 5 OPEN HEARINGS Time: This is a recurring meeting Meet anytime Join Zoom Meeting https://wicourts.zoom.us/j/99160734251 Meeting ID: 991 6073 4251 One tap mobile +13126266799,,99160734251# US (Chicago) +16465588656,,99160734251# US (New York) Dial by your location +1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago) +1 646 558 8656 US (New York) +1 301 715 8592 US (Washington D.C) +1 346 248 7799 US (Houston) +1 669 900 9128 US (San Jose) +1 253 215 8782 US (Tacoma) Meeting ID: 991 6073 4251 Find your local number: https://wicourts.zoom.us/u/aANgJ7NJz Join by SIP 99160734251@zoomcrc.com Join by H.323 162.255.37.11 (US West) 162.255.36.11 (US East) 115.114.131.7 (India Mumbai) 115.114.115.7 (India Hyderabad) 213.19.144.110 (Amsterdam Netherlands) 213.244.140.110 (Germany) 103.122.166.55 (Australia) 149.137.40.110 (Singapore) 64.211.144.160 (Brazil) 69.174.57.160 (Canada) 207.226.132.110 (Japan) Meeting ID: 991 6073 4251

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Objection to debtor's answer & demand for hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Garnishment hearing on January 7, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance of filing agent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: GD: Sounds on Wheels

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: NOTICE OF MEDIATION RETURNED WITH NEW ADDRESS, def emailed information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Schmidt, Steven E.; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Steven E. Schmidt Current: 2538 S. 75th St., West Allis, WI 53219 United States (Effective: 06-24-2021) Prior: 2012 Viking Ave, Holmen, WI 54636 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Mediation scheduled- notice mailed to def as unable to leave message on phone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Mediation hearing on June 25, 2021 at 10:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Contested- set for mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004342, Payable Number: 183391, Receipt Number: 21R 007252, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less