This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 02/03/2022 at 01:12:19 (UTC).

Heartland Credit Union vs. Chad R. Cook et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Heartland Credit Union filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Chad R Cook. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is VanDeHey, Robert P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0216

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

VanDeHey, Robert P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heartland Credit Union

5325 High Crossing Blvd.

Madison, WI 53718

Defendants

Cook, Chad R.

Platteville, WI 53818

Cook, Kathleen K.

Platteville, WI 53818

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darnieder, Mark C., Jr

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004208, Payable Number: 145462, Receipt Number: 21R 004945, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: GRANT; Case number: 2021SC000216; Caption: Heartland Credit Union vs. Chad R. Cook et al; Total Amount: $569.5; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Replevin granted for 2002 Chevrolet Tahoe VIN: 1GNEK13Z52J111793; Judgment Party; Party Name: Chad R. Cook; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1422 Butson Rd., Platteville, WI 53818 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Kathleen K. Cook; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1422 Butson Rd., Platteville, WI 53818 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Heartland Credit Union; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 5325 High Crossing Blvd., Madison, WI 53718 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $300.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Additional Text: Replevin order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment after motion; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service - Kathleen Cook $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service - Chad Cook $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment; Additional Text: Replevin Order for Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002052, Payable Number: 144330, Receipt Number: 21R 002749, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darnieder, Mark C., Jr