This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 01/31/2022 at 16:29:32 (UTC).

Grant Regional Health Center Inc vs. Noah W King

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 Grant Regional Health Center Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Noah W King. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Day, Craig R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0024

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Day, Craig R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grant Regional Health Center Inc

500 S. Monroe

Lancaster, WI 53813

Defendant

King, Noah W

Fennimore, WI 53809

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fletcher, Christopher Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001606, Payable Number: 143963, Receipt Number: 21R 001895, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001606, Payable Number: 143963, Receipt Number: 21R 001895, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Day, Craig R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Day, Craig R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: GRANT; Case number: 2021SC000024; Caption: Grant Regional Health Center Inc vs. Noah W King; Total Amount: $838.23; Judgment Party; Party Name: Noah W King; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1340 11th Street, Fennimore, WI 53809 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Grant Regional Health Center Inc; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 500 S. Monroe, Lancaster, WI 53813 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $671.73; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Day, Craig R; Court Reporter: Wiest, Nichole; Additional Text: Court is held by conference call. Plaintiff Grant Regional Health Center Inc and Attorney Christopher Lee Fletcher not in court. Defendant Noah W King appeared by phone. Defendant does not wish to contest the claim. Court grants Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Day, Craig R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000093, Payable Number: 143098, Receipt Number: 21R 000143, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on February 1, 2021 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fletcher, Christopher Lee