This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 08:26:57 (UTC).

George Brown vs. Alliyah Williams & Alexus Williams

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 George Brown filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alliyah Williams Alexus Williams. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Bjerke, Todd W and Wickler, Jody R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0199

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Bjerke, Todd W

Wickler, Jody R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brown, George

La Crosse, WI 54602

Defendants

Williams, Alexus

La Crosse, WI 54602

Williams, Alliyah

La Crosse, WI 54602

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Party dismissed for Williams, Alliyah; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W; Additional Text: no service was made on A. Williams, no answer to status letter sent, this party is dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: status letter from SC Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: NEJ & FDS, unable to forward for Alexus Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021SC000199; Caption: George Brown vs. Alliyah Williams & Alexus Williams; Total Amount: $1986.5; Judgment Party; Party Name: George Brown; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 004, La Crosse, WI 54602; Judgment Party; Party Name: Alexus Williams; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 802 S 7th St #5, La Crosse, WI 54602; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1890.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $96.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Additional Text: MAIL RETURNED FOR ALLIYAH WILLIAMS. Judgement granted for Alexus Williams.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: S&C for Alliyah Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $96.5; Additional Text: 21R 001345

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less