This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 20:44:40 (UTC).

Genesis Financial & Payment Systems Wisconsin, LLC vs. Allen Ciesielski

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Genesis Financial Payment Systems Wisconsin, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Allen Ciesielski. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A, Christensen, Samuel A and Fredrickson, Jon E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1561

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A

Christensen, Samuel A

Fredrickson, Jon E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Genesis Financial & Payment Systems Wisconsin, LLC

3175 Commercial Ave Suite 201

Northbrook, IL 60062

Defendant

CIESIELSKI, ALLEN

Racine, WI 53406

Garnishee

Sign Effectz, Inc.

Attn: Payroll/Garnishments, 1827 W. Glendale Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stueckroth, Richard E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Garnishment hearing; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.; Location: Br 7 - Courthouse - 4th Floor Courtroom; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment - objection to debtors answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment - debtor's answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Garnishment hearing on February 28, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Ciesielski, Allen; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Allen Ciesielski Current: 5525 Spring St, Racine, WI 53406 United States (Effective: 12-16-2021) Prior: 3008 Cindy Dr, Racine, WI 53404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 868930, Payable Number: 446193, Receipt Number: 21R 012184F, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 868930, Payable Number: 446193, Receipt Number: 21R 012184F, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment docketed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 551147, Payable Number: 438891, Receipt Number: 21R 008394F, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Ciesielski, Allen; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Allen Ciesielski Current: 3008 Cindy Dr, Racine, WI 53404 (Effective: 06-18-2021) Prior: 5525 SPRING ST, Racine, WI 53406 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on June 24, 2021 at 08:15 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $1288.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 315340, Payable Number: 433244, Receipt Number: 21R 005293F, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan Transaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stueckroth, Richard E