This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2022 at 04:42:32 (UTC).

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC vs. JOSE AVILA

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE AVILA. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Resar, Chad. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2473

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Resar, Chad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

4730 South Ft Apache Rd Ste 300

Las Vegas, NV 89147-7947

Defendant

AVILA, JOSE

Green Bay, WI 54302-3044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fingert, Evan R

Thielhelm, Paul H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 018963, Payable Number: 327472, Receipt Number: 21R 025912, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BROWN; Case number: 2021SC002473; Caption: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC vs. JOSE AVILA; Total Amount: $1690.53; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: JOSE AVILA; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1042 NEWTOLS ST, Green Bay, WI 54302-3044 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 4730 SOUTH FT APACHE RD STE 300, Las Vegas, NV 89147-7947 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1424.03; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Resar, Chad; Additional Text: 01:21 PM Defendant JOSE AVILA in court. Attorney Evan R Fingert in court for Plaintiff Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 015605, Payable Number: 324630, Receipt Number: 21R 020717, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thielhelm, Paul H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fingert, Evan R