This case was last updated from Sawyer County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 20:20:53 (UTC).

Frank Bennett et al vs. John Packer et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 Frank Bennett filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against John Packer. This case was filed in Sawyer County Courts, Sawyer County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Yackel, John M and Anderson, John P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sawyer, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Yackel, John M

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bennett, Frank

Edina, MN 55424

Lenard, Mary

Edina, MN 55424

Defendants

Packer, John

Marco Island, FL 34145

Packer, Karen

Marco Island, FL 34145

J&K Packer Revocable Trust (Dated January 11, 2011)

986 Sundrop Court

Marco Island, FL 34145

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Torvinen, Kyle Hoff

Defendant Attorneys

Sztainer, Taylor

Renslow, Megan Jean

Schumann, Glen E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Location: Sawyer County Courthouse LCR; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Location: Sawyer County Courthouse LCR; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Location: Sawyer County Courthouse LCR; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Judicial Pretrial - in court; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Location: Sawyer County Small Courtroom; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final pre-trial; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Location: Sawyer County Courthouse LCR; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. scheduling order; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: cover letter to proposed scheduling order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Expert witness list - plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Glen Schumann, Megan Renslow & Taylor Sztainer of Moss & Barnett law firm for Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Glen Schumann, Megan Renslow & Taylor Sztainer of Moss & Barnett law firm for Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Glen E Schumann, (Taylor Pro Hac Vice forthcoming??) for John and Karen Packer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone scheduling conference on September 27, 2021 at 03:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Scheudling conference set with attorney Torvinen's office.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: J&K Packer Revocable Trust by Collier County S.O. Deputy Schafer # 960 on 2/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: of John Packer by Collier County S.O. Deputy Schafer # 960 on 2/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: of Karen Packer by Collier County S.O. Deputy Schafer # 960 on 2/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000315, Payable Number: 65817, Receipt Number: 21R 000477, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less