This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 21:26:08 (UTC).

Francis Clements & Elaine Clements vs Larry Mikshowsky & Donna Mikshowsky

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Francis Clements Elaine Clements filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Larry Mikshowsky Donna Mikshowsky. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Elliott M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0359

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Elliott M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clements, Francis

La Crosse, WI 54601

Clements, Elaine

La Crosse, WI 54601

Defendants

Mikshowsky, Larry

Mikshowsky, Donna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Doyle, Steven Patrick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Mikshowsky, Donna; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Donna Mikshowsky Current: NPA, (Effective: 12-07-2021) Prior: W1389 State Road 33, La Crosse, WI 54601 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Mikshowsky, Larry; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Larry Mikshowsky Current: NPA, (Effective: 12-07-2021) Prior: W1389 State Road 33, La Crosse, WI 54601 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Atty Doyle - waiting on final survey map and we believe we have an agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to parties req status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service Donna Mikshowsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service-Larry Mikshowsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005988, Payable Number: 184825, Receipt Number: 21R 010120, Amount: $184.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Doyle, Steven Patrick