This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 03:11:15 (UTC).

Fox Valley Emergency Medicine S.C. vs. Paul Donnermeyer

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 Fox Valley Emergency Medicine S C filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Paul Donnermeyer. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Keberlein, Bryan D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0211

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Keberlein, Bryan D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fox Valley Emergency Medicine S.C.

Appleton, WI 54912

Defendant

Donnermeyer, Paul

Menasha, WI 54952

Garnishee

H20 Under Pressure

Dale, WI 54931

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Foscato, John Anthony

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 115143, Payable Number: 297314, Receipt Number: 21R 007330, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 115143, Payable Number: 297314, Receipt Number: 21R 007330, Amount: $92.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 113095, Payable Number: 296387, Receipt Number: 21R 005473, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WINNEBAGO; Case number: 2021SC000211; Caption: Fox Valley Emergency Medicine S.C. vs. Paul Donnermeyer; Total Amount: $1286.71; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Paul Donnermeyer; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1208 Grove St., Menasha, WI 54952 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Fox Valley Emergency Medicine S.C.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 8031, Appleton, WI 54912 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1015.21; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $22.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.; Additional Text: Default judgment granted. NEJ/Judgment with FDS mailed to parties. Plaintiff Fox Valley Emergency Medicine S.C. and Attorney John Anthony Foscato not in court. Defendant Paul Donnermeyer not in court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on February 24, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: $10,15.21 / Summons and Complaint mailed to DE 01-25-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 055886, Payable Number: 294776, Receipt Number: 21R 002259, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foscato, John Anthony