This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 02/01/2022 at 10:38:42 (UTC).

Fort HealthCare vs. JESSE DAVID JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Fort HealthCare filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JESSE DAVID JOHNSON. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Brantmeier, Bennett J, Weber, Jennifer and Hamre Incha, Cindy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0150

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Brantmeier, Bennett J

Weber, Jennifer

Hamre Incha, Cindy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fort HealthCare

Fort Atkinson, WI 53538

Defendant

JOHNSON, JESSE DAVID

Fort Atkinson, WI 53538

Garnishee

Lunda Construction Company

Po Box 669

Black River Falls, WI 54615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westrick, David

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Fort HealthCare; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Fort HealthCare Current: PO Box 306, Fort Atkinson, WI 53538 United States (Effective: 04-08-2021) Prior: PO BOX 249, Fort Atkinson, WI 53538 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Garnishee: Lunda Construction Company :: Amount of Creditor's Claim: $1563.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 086360, Payable Number: 181018, Receipt Number: 21R 006737, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 086360, Payable Number: 181018, Receipt Number: 21R 006737, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: JEFFERSON; Case number: 2021SC000150; Caption: Fort HealthCare vs. JESSE DAVID JOHNSON; Total Amount: $1563.02; Judgment Party; Party Name: JESSE DAVID JOHNSON; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 627 N MAIN ST, Fort Atkinson, WI 53538 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Fort HealthCare; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 306, Fort Atkinson, WI 53538; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1258.52; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $40.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Court Reporter: Unmonitored DAR; Additional Text: {This hearing is being conducted via Zoom videoconferencing.} Attorney David Westrick appeared by phone means for Plaintiff Fort HealthCare. Defendant JESSE DAVID JOHNSON appeared by video means. The Defendant appears but does not contest the matter; therefore, the Court grants Judgment in favor of the Plaintiff. Defendant confirms address on file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Court Reporter: Unmonitored DAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hamre Incha, Cindy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of substitute service; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: Jesse David Johnson was served by substitute service (S&C).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $1258.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 021575, Payable Number: 179337, Receipt Number: 21R 002026, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Westrick, David