This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 21:07:49 (UTC).

Focus Property Management vs. Heather Utech

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Focus Property Management filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Heather Utech. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Keberlein, Bryan D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1305

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Keberlein, Bryan D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Focus Property Management

109 E. 8Th Street, Suite 1

Kaukauna, WI 54130

Defendant

Utech, Heather

Watertown, WI 53094

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WINNEBAGO; Case number: 2021SC001305; Caption: Focus Property Management vs. Heather Utech; Total Amount: $865.5; Judgment Party; Party Name: Heather Utech; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 107 College St, Watertown, WI 53094; Judgment Party; Party Name: Focus Property Management; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 109 E. 8th Street, Suite 1, Kaukauna, WI 54130 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $706.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $65.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.; Additional Text: Default judgment granted. NEJ/Judgment with FDS mailed to parties. Defendant Heather Utech not in court. Plaintiff Focus Property Management not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Notice of hearing, moved, left no address, unable to forward.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Rent and damages on August 4, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Heather Utech Current: 107 College St, Watertown, WI 53094 United States (Effective: 06-30-2021) Prior: 1629 Rainbow Road - 4, Oshkosh, WI 54902 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.; Additional Text: Eviction dismissed, set for Rent and Damages.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Rent and damages on August 4, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Eviction return date on June 30, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Eviction return date on June 30, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Evicition Protection Declaration submitted by DE at COC window.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: SAC posted and mailed 06-05-2021 ($45)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: $706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by private process; Additional Text: $1,533.67 / Summons and Complaint to be personally served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 283459, Payable Number: 301304, Receipt Number: 21R 016968, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less